NICHOLAS AND JUDITH GOODISON'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gifts to charities concerned with arts and arts-related education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 1991: Standard registration
- SIR NICHOLAS AND LADY GOODISON'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Helen Goodison | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Henry Goodison | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LADY JUDITH NICOLA GOODISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHARINE NICOLA GOODISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.65k | £48.73k | £56.58k | £118.00k | £105.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.45k | £39.43k | £53.10k | £40.00k | £74.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 5TH APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 25 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 55589
LONDON
SW7 9EW
- Phone:
- 07582540133
- Email:
- goodisonn2@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window