PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF HEPTONSTALL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charity run with volunteers in order to raise funds to benefit Heptonstall Junior & Infant School and their children. We run annual school fairs, school discos and a number of other events and seek to secure grants and other funds so that we can provide things like new library books, playground equipment and other required/requested items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Calderdale
Governance
- 13 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jocasta Jones | Chair | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Gosden | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie Leggett | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Emms | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elena de Lison | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £6.32k | £8.72k | £6.39k | £5.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £1.00k | £15.39k | £6.45k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HEPTONSTALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Longfield
HEBDEN BRIDGE
West Yorkshire
HX7 7LR
- Phone:
- 07929962879
- Email:
- pfaheptonstall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window