NATIONAL FEDERATION OF RETIRED AMBULANCE ASSOCIATIONS
Charity Number: 1004156
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 September 1991: Standard registration
- 01 July 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 01 July 2003: Funds transferred to 1094907 AMCARE UK CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other names:
- AMCARE UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE NATIONAL AMBULANCE SERVICE AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS WHO REQUIRE CONVALESCANCE FOLLOWING ILLNESS OR INJURY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.