NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WIDOWS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide comfort and support to widows and widowers, and men and women who have lost their partners through bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 September 1991: Standard registration
- 29 October 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 October 2009: Funds transferred to 1096896 NATIONAL ORGANISATION OF THE WIDOWED
- NAW (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £304.17k | £124.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.68k | £136.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 June 2008 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 13 June 2008 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 March 2006 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 March 2006 | 44 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED 6TH APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF WIDOWS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window