THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST ANDREW,BROMLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist with the preservation repair, maintenance and improvement of the fabric and major furnishings of the parish church of St. Andrew, Burnt Ash Lane, Bromley, Kent and of St. Andrew's Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 18 September 1991: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST. ANDREW'S (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH OF ST ANDREW,BROMLEY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Julie Bowen | Chair | 19 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Veronica Loh | Trustee | 19 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEE WEST | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARTIN | Trustee | 12 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE DULLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA MARGARET DULLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.52k | £2.10k | £2.02k | £24.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £1.52k | £1.07k | £1.50k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH AUGUST 1991
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST WITH THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC AND MAJOR FURNISHINGS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW, BURNT ASH LANE, BROMLEY, AND ST. ANDREW'S CHURCH HALL AND TO PROVIDE ARTICLES FOR USE IN WORSHIP IN ST.ANDREW'S CHURCH AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES TO RAISE FUNDS AND COLLECT SUMS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CROMWELL AVENUE
BROMLEY
BR2 9AQ
- Phone:
- 02082905172
- Email:
- andrew@andrewjmartin.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window