Financial history Merrow Junior School PTA

Charity number: 1004186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.73k £9.80k £20.00k £28.92k £28.82k
Total expenditure £10.14k £15.90k £20.11k £14.67k £23.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A