Governing document Merrow Junior School PTA
Charity number: 1004186

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/1990 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2015 as amended on 07 Oct 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MERROW
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.