Accounts and annual returns OTTERHAM AND ST JULIOT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1004211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2025 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required