Financial history OTTERHAM AND ST JULIOT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1004211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.71k £15.01k £22.39k £19.84k £19.56k
Total expenditure £12.37k £12.33k £10.62k £20.02k £27.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.60k £10.67k £400 £300