FRIENDS OF CROOK LOG SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for crook log school through fetes and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bexley
Governance
- 25 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Louise Leaf | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Ann Wilmot | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.21k | £3.00k | £2.55k | £3.00k | £14.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £1.00k | £100 | £1.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2021 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL(NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
BEXLEYHEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Springfield Road
Bexleyheath
DA7 6DX
- Phone:
- 07729469883
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window