KING CHARLES 1 SCHOOL APPEAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to King Charles I school for departments to purchase equipment not financed under the terms of the funding agreement to benefit the education of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 26 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIE MARGARET TINGLEY | Chair | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN GROVE | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY ELIZABETH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Adams | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WARDLE Treasurer | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | £17.24k | £30.71k | £5.07k | £19.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.16k | £10.59k | £33.89k | £93 | £20.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/06/1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 04 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2019 as amended on 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
King Charles I School
Hill Grove House
Comberton Road
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 1XA
- Phone:
- 01562 512880
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window