HEREFORDSHIRE HEADWAY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are concerned with all aspects of the care and rehabilitation of adults with acquired brain injury. We also provide help and support for the families and carers of those with acquire brain injury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 04 October 1991: Standard registration
- 26 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/05/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.20k | £192.25k | £142.61k | £210.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.78k | £199.85k | £157.53k | £194.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 11 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | 23 July 2008 | 114 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 15 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 18 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 18 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 April 2005 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 April 2005 | 67 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED SERIOUS HEAD INJURIES.
Area of benefit
OLD COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window