Financial history HILLINGDON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1004362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.16k £5.05k £7.34k £9.07k £8.28k
Total expenditure £7.10k £2.84k £8.88k £8.22k £8.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A