Trustees HILLINGDON CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1004362

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eirwen Helena Smith | Chair | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Goodhew | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mead | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Donna Louise Porch | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Clare Imogen Dallamore | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joan May Griffiths | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.