FRIENDS OF WOODBURY SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support to patients of Woodbury Surgery, particularly in respect of transport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Devon
Governance
- 15 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Whyte | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judy Elizabeth Green | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES REDWOOD FCCA | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Deborah Susan Mullier | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Val Arndt | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES REDWOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.36k | £1.29k | £2.68k | £11.30k | £924 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.36k | £1.37k | £1.31k | £12.26k | £403 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND. SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN WOODBURY, WOODBURY SALTERTON, AYLESBEARE, FARRINGDON, CLYST ST. MARY, CLYST ST. GEORGE, EBFORD, EXTON, LYMPSTONE, EXMOUTH, YETTINGTON, EAST BUDLEIGH, COLATON RALEIGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER HAWKERLAND
SIDMOUTH ROAD
AYLESBEARE
EXETER
EX5 2JJ
- Phone:
- 07730045444
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window