CALEB INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In addition to help fund individuals and organisations who are showing God's love in action to very needy people in the UK and worldwide, the charity is providing care, support and education to orphans and at risk children in the Kaliro District and in a poor suburb of Entebbe, in Uganda. The total income is given out without making any deductions for administrative or other costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
Governance
- 11 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAHADEVAN THALAYASINGAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA SUGANTHI THALAYASINGAM | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERIC LANGFORD CURNOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.88k | £193.05k | £138.60k | £34.53k | £31.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.38k | £184.30k | £140.31k | £28.90k | £33.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 DALE GREEN ROAD
LONDON
N11 1DN
- Phone:
- 02083613278
- Email:
- caleb.initiative@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window