TRANSCEND IN LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF OUT OF SCHOOL SERVICES: CLUBS, PLAYSCHEMES, OUTINGS. EXTENSIVE ANNUAL STAFF TRAINING AND LEARNING PROGRAMME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Islington
Governance
- 04 October 1991: Standard registration
- 18 April 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.13k | £108.95k | £124.18k | £128.05k | £138.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.18k | £105.06k | £112.85k | £132.40k | £141.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 24 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 25 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MAY 1990 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 26TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE CARE, COUNSELLING, EDUCATIONAL TRAINING AND VOCATIONAL GUIDANCE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window