SAVS (SEXUAL ABUSE VICTIM SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 October 1991: Standard registration
- 15 August 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SAVS (Working name)
- SAVI (SEXUAL ABUSE VICTIM OF INCEST) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £795 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 04 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 04 April 2005 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ADULTS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST IN CHILDHOOD IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BOLTON
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BOLTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window