Governing document HAMELIN TRUST
Charity number: 1004432

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1991 as amended on 23 May 2016 as amended on 25 Nov 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2019 as amended on 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
To promote the relief of people of all ages who have learning disabilities and/or physical disability and/or sensory impairment and/or are suffering mental distress.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.