Accounts and annual returns u3a in Bath

Charity number: 1004449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window