OXFORD CITY SPORT IN THE COMMUNITY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to provide facilities and support for young people and vulnerable adults to play football and other sports and to develop sport generally. Our policy is sport for all - to cover all ranges of skills and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 October 1991: Standard registration
- OXFORD CITY FOOTBALL CLUB (1988) LIMITED (Previous name)
- OXFORD CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Best | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hextall | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Odhiambo | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greig Box Turnbull | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Murray | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Merritt | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538.66k | £279.14k | £412.67k | £368.08k | £271.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.48k | £289.04k | £459.09k | £377.62k | £311.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £86.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £538.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £403.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 August 2023 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 August 2023 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JULY 1991, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 OCTOBER 1998 AND 27 JANUARY 2007. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 OCT 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PERSONS OF COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDERGOING HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION TO BE TRAINED IN AND PLAY ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS SO AS TO ASSIST IN THEIR PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxford City Football Club
Court Place Farm
Marsh Lane
Headington
OXFORD
OX3 0NQ
- Phone:
- 07876682501
- Email:
- paul.lyon@oxcityfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window