GUESTLING BRADSHAW PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising from organising events, summer fairs, commissions etc purely to benefit the teachers and pupils of the school by purchasing play/learning equipment and subsidising events/trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 11 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Mannering | Chair | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Stevens | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eve Elphick | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Cornford | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Collins | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Heyes | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Old | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE CUFF | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.37k | £5.88k | £2.30k | £9.20k | £9.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.92k | £1.55k | £881 | £12.46k | £8.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2021 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1970
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guestling Bradshaw School
Guestling
HASTINGS
TN35 4LS
- Phone:
- 01424812279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window