Financial history AVOCET TRUST

Charity Number: 1004537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.64m £6.42m £6.44m £5.90m £7.07m
Total expenditure £6.71m £6.24m £6.26m £6.33m £7.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £6.07m N/A £310.71k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £363.57k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.61m £6.42m £6.07m £5.90m £7.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £32.34k £0 £363.57k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.67m £6.24m £6.26m £6.33m £7.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £43.84k £138.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £36.84k £0 £0 £0 £0