BURY PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly meetings with either visitors or Society members giving talks on their photographic interests. There are a series of practical nights held and an Annual Exhibition of member's work is held in the local Art Gallery. Members also visit other external organisations and give talks on their particular interest in photography. Members images are on display at the local hospice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bury
Governance
- 09 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Hoyle | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Simms | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Leach | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Wilson | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Hogg | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bowker | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Garry Hayes | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wood | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lodge | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROY TURNER | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.11k | £2.72k | £3.64k | £3.73k | £5.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.38k | £2.67k | £8.79k | £4.04k | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 9 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 15 AUGUST 1991 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 12 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE AND ENJOYMENT OF PHOTOGRAPHY AS AN ART
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 PICKERING CLOSE
BURY
BL8 1UE
- Phone:
- 01617972889
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window