RADIANT LIFE MINISTRIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ministering to the spiritual needs of the older generation through music, song and teaching, in sheltered housing accommodation and other groups. Also ministry to husbands in strengthening and enriching marriage in the form of a two hour seminar. Specific ministry to men. Providing teaching from a christian standpoint on coping with life in today's world within 50 miles aprox of Middleton, M/r.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackpool
- Bolton
- Bury
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 11 October 1991: Standard registration
- 11 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £1.75k | £2.01k | £1.53k | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £1.82k | £2.05k | £1.64k | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JULY 1991
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS (11)THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION (111)THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window