CITIZENS ADVICE WOKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bureau offers a free service to any member of the public who may be unaware of their rights and responsibilities by reason of ignorance of such rights or of the availability of the service or through an inability to express their needs in an effective manner.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £274,171 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 October 1991: Standard registration
- 04 February 2022: Funds received from 1142319 CITIZENS ADVICE SURREY
- WOKING CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Brown | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kawther Hashmi | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Harlow | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Annandale | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John David Butler | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Chris Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Smith | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Oates | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.29k | £418.62k | £507.07k | £592.08k | £485.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.84k | £374.22k | £409.95k | £653.60k | £520.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £252.71k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £218.00k | £218.00k | N/A | £274.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £21.99k | £23.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £4.99k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £477.18k | £560.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £20 | £338 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.90k | £7.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £409.95k | £653.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WOKING AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
WOKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITIZENS ADVICE WOKING
PROVINCIAL HOUSE
26 COMMERCIAL WAY
WOKING
SURREY
GU21 6EN
- Phone:
- 01483541606
- Email:
- thirdparty@wokingcab.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window