ORMSKIRK AND DISTRICT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities at present are transcribing gravestones, then recording on cd's for sale to members. Monthly meetings with speakers on family history subjects and visits to local historical places. We also open our premises every Monday for 2 hours where members can research and get advice and help if needed. To promote ourselves more widely, we attend local shows whenever possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Hurst | Chair | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Ian MacDonald | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Gregson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Broadbent | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cooper | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dot Broady-Hawkes | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn MacDonald | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jenkins | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dean | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE GOLICS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.26k | £2.39k | £11.99k | £2.63k | £6.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.51k | £2.31k | £2.81k | £2.95k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED 9 OCTOBER 1991 as amended on 26 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC AND PRIVATE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY. FOR FURTHER INFO. PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
WESTERN LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 27 Bath Springs
Ormskirk
L39 2XP
- Phone:
- 07856886809
- Email:
- secretary@odfhs.email
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window