EPSOM MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to purchase medical equipment for Epsom General Hospital. Sales, raffles, events such as barn dance, car boot sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 October 1991: Standard registration
- 22 May 2020: Funds received from 269869 TATTENHAMS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Arthur Houghton MB BS | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mashkur Hussain Khan | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Russell Hull | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marion Landeg RGN | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Carter | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sylvia Roberts | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARGARET JANET SEMPLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.08k | £63.52k | £41.74k | £47.46k | £55.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.84k | £53.70k | £69.10k | £228.21k | £55.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT AT EPSOM GENERAL HOSPITAL AND ELSEWHERE IN SURREY OR THE SURROUNDING AREA WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
EPSOM AND ELSEWHERE IN SURREY OR THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Tealing Drive
Epsom
KT19 0JS
- Phone:
- 02083378181
- Email:
- bessharding42@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window