OHEL SARAH UK

Charity Number: 1004992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity collected funds to cover grants made for the benefit of children with special needs. The charity itself does not deal with children with special needs but provides funding to another organisation which delivers the care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £352,326
Total expenditure: £345,394

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 1991: Standard registration
  • 07 April 2022: Funds received from 1114617 PETER EPSTEIN CHARITABLE WILL TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BRITISH FRIENDS OF OHEL SARAH (Previous name)
  • BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE OHEL SARAH INSTITUTE FOR THE SPECIAL CHILD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Goldberg QC Chair 04 December 2014
None on record
Michelle Smaje Trustee 29 May 2018
MARCH OF THE LIVING (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE RAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEREK ZISSMAN Trustee 04 December 2014
THE WESTERN MARBLE ARCH SYNAGOGUE
Received: 26 days late
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM Trustee
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MORRIS LEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL TRAUMA AND THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SURVIVORS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NEW ISRAEL FUND
Received: On time
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WEIZMANN INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEVONSHIRE STREET CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PETER CRUDDAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DENISE COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SHIRLEY YOUNG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HADASSAH MEDICAL RELIEF ASSOCIATION U.K.
Received: On time
THE RUTH AND JACK LUNZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STELLA AND ALEXANDER MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYBIL SHINE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
YONI JESNER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMERICAN JEWISH JOINT DISTRIBUTION COMMITTEE (UK ) TRUST
Received: On time
JANET WOLFSON DE BOTTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CISSIE ROSEFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE POTEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARNETT AND SYLVIA SHINE NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ADLER TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SHAARE ZEDEK UK
Received: On time
WORCESTER COLLEGE OXFORD ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARCUS MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £370.62k £323.59k £388.08k £373.50k £352.33k
Total expenditure £316.39k £377.07k £328.50k £440.78k £345.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Schaller House
44a Albert Road
LONDON
NW4 2SG
Phone:
02033281636