Financial history FRIENDS OF CASTLE PARK SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1004994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.23k £8.41k £10.52k £11.33k £14.94k
Total expenditure £6.40k £4.84k £7.64k £15.21k £13.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A