THE WHITTLESEY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have four funds. Relief in need, education, public purposes & church. They are self explanitory, except that the church fund is a share of our net income. Our area of benefit is limited to the urban & rural districts of Whittlesey. Applications from outside our district will perhaps not receive a reply.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bradshaw | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Martin Cook | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elisabeth Brown | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emily Davis | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Gerald Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD FISHER KITCHIN | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip David Green | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE RAYNER | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MILES OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.25k | £86.42k | £69.53k | £89.42k | £93.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.56k | £44.29k | £36.25k | £57.33k | £217.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 JUNE 1990.
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS. 2) RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3) PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY SCHOOL SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 4) PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 5) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 6) PAYMENTS TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITTLESEY ST. ANDREW; PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITTLESEY ST. MARY AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, COATES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISHES OF WHITTLESEY URBAN AND WHITTLESEY RURAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Town Hall
18 Market Street
Whittlesey
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 1BD
- Phone:
- 01733204517
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window