BRITISH HOMEOPATHIC DENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the use of Homeopathy as an adjunct to conventional dentistry in Great Britain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 October 1991: Standard registration
- BHDA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA JACQUELINE JUGDEV | Chair | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr KYRIACOS HAJIKAKOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANN MICHELE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/04/2020 | 16/04/2021 | 16/04/2022 | 16/04/2023 | 16/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £1.53k | £1.53k | £1.42k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £470 | £470 | £116 | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 April 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DENTISTS IN THE BASIC PRINCIPLES OF HOMEOPATHY (2)TO ADVANCE PROFESSIONAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE SUBJECT OF HOMEOPATHY THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thirty Three Dental
33 Market Square
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX28 6AD
- Phone:
- 01993772655
- Email:
- thebhda@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window