WORLDWIDE EVANGELICAL MISSION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEM has been dormant for the few years. However, as of this year, the trustees will try to revive it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 October 1991: Standard registration
- 13 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WEM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 March 2014 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 01 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE TRAINING OF MISSIONARIES. 2.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR AMONGST MISSIONARIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window