Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WILDRIDINGS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1005114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.24k £10.44k £4.08k £22.70k £15.78k
Total expenditure £11.07k £13.79k £11.42k £5.76k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A