PENNYWELL NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer activities that promote healthy living, the acquisition of life skills, independence and engagement with neighbours. These vary based on the needs and the expressed wishes of our users. Currently we provide: HEALTH, WELL-BEING AND SELF CARE EDUCATION, GARDENING CLUB, ARTS PROJECT, PEER MENTOR VOLUNTEERS, JOINT WORKING INITIATIVES WITH LOCAL PARTNERS, BREAKOUT (School Holiday Activities)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,092 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sunderland
Governance
- 24 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Gunn | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Doran | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Moore | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Esdaile Boyling | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lovegrove | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUE FOSTER | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY BULMER | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE HANLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.30k | £289.97k | £205.92k | £257.11k | £283.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.92k | £218.01k | £216.92k | £234.28k | £223.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £31.14k | £39.45k | £32.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1991, 8 AUGUST 2000, 20 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 2 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT A NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE AND TO PROMOTE THEREIN AND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES SO AS TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE PENNYWELL ESTATE AND THE NEIGHBOURING ENVIRONS IN SUNDERLAND IN THE COUNTY OF TYNE AND WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pennywell Neighbourhood Centre
Pennywell Shopping Centre
Portsmouth Road
SUNDERLAND
SR4 9AS
- Phone:
- 01915341477
- Email:
- receptionpnc@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window