Trustees PENNYWELL NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE
Charity Number: 1005148

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Gunn | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Doran | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Moore | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Esdaile Boyling | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lovegrove | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUE FOSTER | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY BULMER | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE HANLY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.