DERIAN HOUSE CHILDRENS HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide hospice care and support for children and young people with palliative care needs including support for the whole family. This includes; specialist respite including symptom management, hospice at home, end of life care and bereavement support after death. This care and support is provided in partnership with individual children's local health, social and education professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£7,973,118
Donations and legacies | £5.58m | |
Charitable activities | £156.14k | |
Other trading activities | £1.88m | |
Investments | £357.62k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,321,287
Raising funds | £2.01m | |
Charitable activities | £6.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,165,733 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,817,746 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.01m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.31m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.01m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.31m | |
Retained for future use | £1.82m |
People

128 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
275 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Bolton
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Sefton
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Granato | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patricia Curtis | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Davina Isobel Hanlon | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Rafiq | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Bolton | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHATTERJEE | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MONK | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN SWINDLEY | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ROTHERAM | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77m | £5.11m | £4.70m | £5.67m | £7.97m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69m | £4.84m | £5.72m | £6.34m | £8.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £503.40k | £174.65k | £86.69k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £369.58k | £15.00k | £989.91k | £1.41m | £2.82m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.95m | £3.22m | £3.06m | £3.92m | £5.58m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £504.46k | £439.93k | £856.04k | £1.29m | £1.88m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.44k | £1.22m | £562.86k | £237.91k | £156.14k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £298.85k | £221.24k | £192.20k | £225.52k | £357.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £26.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £823.79k | £1.01m | £589.80k | £553.93k | £538.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.62m | £3.69m | £4.09m | £4.47m | £6.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.07m | £1.16m | £1.63m | £1.87m | £2.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.67k | £4.12k | £4.06k | £9.40k | £11.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £149.30k | £102.11k | £112.46k | £110.23k | £140.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.00m | £4.96m | £5.44m | £5.37m | £5.33m | |
|
Long-term investments | £15.71m | £16.08m | £17.57m | £15.17m | £17.20m | |
|
Other assets | £914.87k | £2.33m | £1.79m | £1.99m | £1.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £428.31k | £410.38k | £518.00k | £859.76k | £431.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DERIAN HOUSE CHILDRENS HOSPICE
CHANCERY ROAD
CHORLEY
PR7 1DH
- Phone:
- 01257 233300
- Email:
- finance@derianhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window