THE BATH GENERAL PRACTICE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION RELEVANT TO PRIMARY CARE AND GENERAL PRACTICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 October 1991: Standard registration
- BATH G P EDUCATION FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Andrew Ward | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Gardner | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter James Phillips | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Marie Lashford | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosanna Rawson-Cain | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR KINGSTON | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.91k | £85.21k | £108.76k | £107.16k | £113.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.47k | £84.41k | £104.86k | £100.06k | £107.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION RESEARCH AND TEACHING IN THE BATH HEALTH DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE FOR GENERAL PRACTITIONERS THEIR STAFF ASSISTANTS MEDICAL STUDENTS CONSULTANTS AND OTHERS WORKING IN ASSOCIATION WITH THEIR PROFESSION. (2)TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT AND RESEARCH OF THE SCIENCE OF MEDICINE IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department D1
Royal United Hospital
Combe Park
Bath
BA1 3NG
- Phone:
- 01225336363
- Email:
- adminbgpert@birdbath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window