Accounts and annual returns FERDINAND BECK FUND

Charity Number: 1005193
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 April 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 24 April 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 May 2023 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 May 2023 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 March 2022 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 10 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window