THE WARREN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1005195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provider of pre-school childcare

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £102,629
Total expenditure: £102,897

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penelope Hannah Dennis Chair 10 March 2022
None on record
Sophie Mundy Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Verity Hoyle Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Joanne Waterhouse Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Ashten Eveleigh-Bacon Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Laura Wyatt Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Lesley Bailey Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Gregory Lawrence Glagow Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Eleanor House Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £98.77k £116.72k £91.13k £92.45k £102.63k
Total expenditure £98.47k £95.20k £90.38k £96.82k £102.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 15 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 June 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 15 June 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Warren Playgroup
St. Peters Church Hall
Church Lane
HENFIELD
BN5 9NY
Phone:
01273495076