1ST BANWELL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group. Provision of Scouting for young people in Banwell and surrounding area & training leaders to work with young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
Governance
- 29 October 1991: Standard registration
- 1ST BANWELL SCOUT & GUIDE GROUP (Working name)
- BANWELL SCOUT GUIDE GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Goddard | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Louise Goddard | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Jane Wooller | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Watson | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Gomm | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Michelle Claire Thomas | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ford | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Watson | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Pole | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.51k | £242.34k | £37.65k | £28.45k | £18.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.54k | £389.27k | £29.49k | £44.08k | £23.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.43k | £11.67k | £1.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4TH. JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Homestead
Cooks Lane
BANWELL
Avon
BS29 6DS
- Phone:
- 07968411134
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window