Financial history CHIPPING SODBURY MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1005346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £6.73k £63 £4.59k £55.45k £7.43k
Total expenditure £6.67k £184 £5.46k £13.08k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A