Financial history THE OXFORD SINFONIA

Charity number: 1005364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.48k £5.10k £0 £15.74k £14.54k
Total expenditure £14.38k £7.45k £1.62k £22.06k £16.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A