Accounts and annual returns GLOSSOPDALE COMMUNITY COLLEGE BAND FUND

Charity number: 1005370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 June 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 June 2023 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 March 2022 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 March 2022 649 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required