BUNBURY JUBILEE PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage the pavillion, the playing fields and associated sports for the village of Bunbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 30 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN HERBERT DYKES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL DEVONPORT | Trustee | 18 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CRAVEN PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £4.68k | £5.70k | £6.92k | £465 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £3.97k | £4.92k | £5.05k | £3.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BUNBURY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUNBURY COTTAGE
SCHOOL LANE
BUNBURY
TARPORLEY
CW6 9PA
- Phone:
- 01829260681
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window