SOUTH ASIAN DEVELOPMENT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SADP exists to facilitate and catalyse entrepreneurial initiatives in the UK, South Asia, and the Diaspora. We work to stimulate awareness and creative responses to social, economic, educational and health issues that affect the South Asian community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 1991: Standard registration
- SOUTH ASIAN DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALRAM GIDOOMAL CBE | Chair | 29 October 1991 |
|
|||||
Celia Mahtani | Trustee | 05 January 1995 |
|
|||||
SUNITA GIDOOMAL | Trustee | 05 January 1995 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16 | £8 | £1 | £136 | £902 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100 | £761 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH OCTOBER 1991 AND SCHEME OF 3RD SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF IN SOUTH EAST ASIA OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT IN SOUTH EAST ASIA OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Tudor Close
Cheam
SUTTON
SM3 8QS
- Phone:
- 020 8412 1195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window