Financial history 1ST COTTINGLEY GUIDES GROUP

Charity Number: 1005427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.52k £24.15k £18.31k £7.58k £9.15k
Total expenditure £5.21k £4.18k £14.64k £7.25k £6.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £23.28k £15.83k N/A N/A