ST MARY'S SCHOOL WINKFIELD PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Events : Summer and Christmas Fairs, Childrens entertainments, Parent evenings and family gatherings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 31 October 1991: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Louise Purchase | Chair | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lynch | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Woodward | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kersti Ludvig | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Garbutt | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £4.01k | £5.76k | £11.04k | £17.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.57k | £3.63k | £2.94k | £7.94k | £14.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
ST. MARY'S SCHOOL, BRACKNELL. BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys C Of E Primary School
Winkfield Row
Winkfield Row
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG42 6NH
- Phone:
- 01344882422
- Email:
- pta@wsmschool.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window