KINGSWOOD VILLAGE PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a Playgroup and Toddler group for preschool aged children in the village of Kingswood and surrounding area.Fundraising activities to support the above groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £40,850 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 November 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Ruth Stocker | Chair | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Sheldon | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Alexis Kirk | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.30k | £58.53k | £58.63k | £77.41k | £73.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.33k | £59.07k | £61.36k | £68.40k | £76.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.56k | £32.19k | £31.41k | £47.99k | £40.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 274 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 20 NOVEMBER 1995, 13 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 7 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE KINGSWOOD, WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE, GLOS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingswood Village Hall
Wickwar Road
Kingswood
Wotton Under Edge
GL12 8RF
- Phone:
- 07855 105944
- Email:
- playgroupkingswood@gmail.com
- Website:
-
kingswoodvillageplaygroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window