Financial history Ashford and Tenterden Umbrella

Charity Number: 1005517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.00k £64.54k £52.46k £43.97k £36.12k
Total expenditure £42.00k £36.98k £22.55k £40.48k £60.33k
Income from government contracts N/A £10.39k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A